EP1298597 - Simulation of effects of cosmetic products using a three-dimensional facial image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rubinstenn, Gilles 295 rue Saint-Jacques 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
Giacchetti, Daniela 71 rue d'Auteuil 75106 Paris / FR | 03 /
Pruche, Francis 17 avenue de la Nonette 60300 Senlis / FR | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François, et al Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Tanty, François, et al Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02021618.0 | 27.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | US20010325559P | 01.10.2001 Original published format: US 325559 P | US20010024615 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 24615 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1298597 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1298597 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/40 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
A45D44/005 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/1034 (EP,US);
A61B5/411 (EP,US);
A61B5/442 (EP,US);
A61B5/444 (EP,US);
A61B5/445 (EP,US);
A61B5/446 (EP,US);
A61B5/7475 (EP,US);
G01J3/52 (EP,US);
G01J3/524 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/661 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/39] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Simulation von Effekten kosmetischer Produkte unter Verwendung eines dreidimensionalen Bildes eines Gesichts | [2003/14] | English: | Simulation of effects of cosmetic products using a three-dimensional facial image | [2003/14] | French: | Simulation des effets de produits cosmetiques à base d'une image tridimensionnelle d'un visage | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/24] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0076398 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 13,19,21 * page 4, lines 15-18 ** figure 5 *; | [DXY]EP1134701 (INFINITEFACE INC [US]) [DX] 1-12,14,15,17,18,20,22-25 * abstract * * column 4, lines 33-38 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 33 * * column 7, lines 8,9 * * column 9, lines 49-52 * * column 16, line 50 - column 17, line 3 * * claims 8,10,14 * * figure 1 * [Y] 13,19,21; | [X] - NOBORI K ET AL, "Image Synthesis System Using 3D Model-based Coding - Simulates Facial Expressions And Aging", CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, 1992. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. ICCE., IEEE 1992 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROSEMONT, IL, USA 2-4 JUNE 1992, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19920602), ISBN 0-7803-0479-9, pages 394 - 395, XP010103027 [X] 1-3,5,8,16,22-25 * the whole document * |