EP1274253 - Video coding device and video decoding device with a motion compensated interframe prediction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hibi, Keiichi 3-328-B-211 Shinmatsudo Matsudo-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Ema, Nobuyuki 6-6-1-206 MinamiNagareyama Nagareyama-shi, Chiba / JP | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02021632.1 | 29.08.1996 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | JP19950220387 | 29.08.1995 Original published format: JP 22038795 | JP19950270262 | 18.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27026295 | JP19960003918 | 12.01.1996 Original published format: JP 391896 | JP19960061267 | 18.03.1996 Original published format: JP 6126796 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1274253 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1274253 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
G06T9/008 (EP,US);
H04N19/109 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
H04N19/517 (EP,US);
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | H04N7/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/02] | Title | German: | Videokodierungsvorrichtung und Videodekodierungsvorrichtung mit bewegungskompensierter Interframe-Prädiktion | [2003/02] | English: | Video coding device and video decoding device with a motion compensated interframe prediction | [2003/02] | French: | Dispositif de codage vidéo et dispositif de décodage vidéo à prédiction intertrame avec compensation du mouvement | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96306265.8 / EP0765087 | Divisional application(s) | EP09075265.0 / EP2129133 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960306265) is 25.02.2000 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0395275 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 12 * * figures 1,27 *; | [A]US4974084 (FERNANDO GERARD M X [GB]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 18 - column 3, line 31 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9203799 (TELEVERKET [SE]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US5412430 (NAGATA ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 41 *; | [A] - ARMITANO R ET AL, "LINEAR PREDICTIVE CODING OF MOTION VECTORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE PICTURE CODING SYMPOSIUM, (199409), pages 233 - 236, XP008023240 [A] 1-6 * section "Introduction" * | Examination | - KIM J W ET AL, "RATE-DISTORTION OPTIMIZATION BETWEEN THE HIERARCHICAL VARIABLE BLOCK SIZE MOTION ESTIMATION AND MOTION SEQUENCE CODING", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, US, vol. 2501, doi:10.1117/12.206788, ISSN 0277-786X, (19950524), pages 822 - 833, (20041208), XP000914348 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.206788 |