Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
22.07.2005 | Change - designated states | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
30.06.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.03.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.03.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.03.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] |
15.10.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.07.2004 | Publication of search report | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
21.02.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |