Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1300557 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2004 | A3 | EP1300557 | 09.04.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10148601 | 02.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10148601 | 25.01.2007 | B4 | DE10148601 | 24.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10148601 | 02.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6688271 | 10.02.2004 | B2 | US2003062014 | 03.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10148601 | 02.10.2001 |