EP1300557 - Variable intake manifold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanders, Michael An der Linde 23 41564 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
Langner, Frank Dobacher Strasse 128 52146 Würselen / DE | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | von Kirschbaum, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022012.5 | 01.10.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | DE2001148601 | 02.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10148601 | [2003/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300557 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300557 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02B27/02 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
F02D9/103 (EP,US);
F02B27/02 (US);
F02B27/0215 (EP);
F02B27/0273 (EP);
F02D9/102 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/19] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltsaugrohr | [2003/15] | English: | Variable intake manifold | [2003/15] | French: | Conduit d'aspiration de commande | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 06.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0819875 (EATON SA MONACO [MC]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 44; figures 1,2,4 *; | [DY]DE19714311 (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [DY] 1-4 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]WO0179673 (SAXONIA UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,7 * page 3, line 11 - page 6, line 9; figures 2-4 *; | EP1272750 [ ] (SAXONIA UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE19714311 |