12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
09.11.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
26.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
17.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
23.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
22.12.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
27.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
30.12.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] |
08.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.09.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
05.05.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.04.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
06.04.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.12.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
24.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
21.03.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
21.03.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |