Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100436308B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2004 | B1 | KR20030029425 | 14.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3638929B | Global Dossier | 13.04.2005 | B2 | JP2003182755 | 03.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1308400 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2006 | B1 | EP1308400 | 07.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE317809T | 15.03.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0204308 | 16.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1214952C | 17.08.2005 | C | CN1420062 | 28.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60209174T | 19.10.2006 | T2 | DE60209174D1 | 20.04.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1308400T | 19.06.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2258125T | 16.08.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1053292 | 17.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1308400E | 30.06.2006 | E | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6637321 | 28.10.2003 | B2 | US2003070563 | 17.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010061971 | 08.10.2001 |