EP1405710 - Wide mouth preform with internal sealing zone protected against mechanical wear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amcor Limited 679 Victoria Street Abbotsford Victoria 3067 / AU | [2008/21] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states AMCOR LIMITED 679 Victoria Street Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haesendonckx, Frank Kerkplaats 60 B5 2990 Wuustwezel / BE | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Matkowska, Franck, et al Matkowska & Associés 9, rue Jacques Prévert 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Matkowska, Franck, et al Matkowska & Associés 9 rue Jacques Prévert 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | ||
Former [2004/47] | Matkowska, Franck, et al Matkowska & Associés 10, avenue de la Créativité 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | ||
Former [2004/15] | Matkowska, Franck, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 27bis, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 02022178.4 | 04.10.2002 | [2004/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405710 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405710 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/00 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
B29C49/071 (EP);
B29C2949/072 (EP);
B29C2949/0722 (EP);
B29C2949/0723 (EP);
B29C2949/0724 (EP);
B29C2949/073 (EP);
B29C2949/0731 (EP);
B29C2949/0732 (EP);
B29C2949/0733 (EP);
B29C2949/0767 (EP);
B29C2949/077 (EP);
B29C2949/0772 (EP);
B29C2949/0829 (EP);
B29C2949/22 (EP);
B29C2949/24 (EP);
B29C2949/26 (EP);
B29C2949/28 (EP);
B29K2021/00 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29K2105/253 (EP);
B29L2031/7158 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/01] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Weithalsvorformling mit Schutz gegen mechanische Schäden des Innenabdichtungsbereichs | [2004/15] | English: | Wide mouth preform with internal sealing zone protected against mechanical wear | [2004/15] | French: | Préforme plastique à large col avec zone d'étanchéité interne protegée contre les détériorations mécaniques | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 08.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, SK, TR | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 21.05.2008 | [2008/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000211017 ; | JP2000211017 [ ]; | [X]US4818213 (ROY SIEGFRIED S [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 20 * * column 2, line 7 - line 14 * * column 6, line 52 - line 63 * * column 15, line 47 - line 56 *; | [XY]EP0978456 (A K TECH LAB INC [JP]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 1 - line 23 * * column 6, line 20 - column 7, line 27; figures 3,10,11 * [Y] 5; | [A]US6051295 (SCHLOSS FRANCIS M [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 25 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000211017 A 20000802 (TSUTSUMI YOTARO) [Y] 5 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 57, Database accession no. 2000-596590, XP002233958 & JP2000211017 A 00000000 [ ] * abstract * |