EP1269880 - Packaging and cover for packaging for cosmetic or pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coty SA 54, rue de Londres 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mathiez, Jean-Louis 36, avenue de la Gare 91470 Limours / FR | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Doireau, Marc Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Doireau, Marc Cabinet Orès 6, avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02022185.9 | 22.11.1999 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | FR19980014759 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9814759 | FR19980014760 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9814760 | FR19980014761 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9814761 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1269880 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269880 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A45C13/00, A45D33/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A45C13/008 (EP);
B65D79/0087 (EP,US);
A45D33/006 (EP);
A45D40/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/01] | Title | German: | Verpackung und Abdeckelement zum Verpacken von kosmetischen oder pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzungen | [2003/01] | English: | Packaging and cover for packaging for cosmetic or pharmaceutical compositions | [2003/01] | French: | Emballage et couverture pour emballage de compositions cosmétiques ou pharmaceutiques | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 23.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99972504.7 / EP1143824 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.08.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | BE | 07.04.2004 | CH | 07.04.2004 | CY | 07.04.2004 | FI | 07.04.2004 | LI | 07.04.2004 | NL | 07.04.2004 | DK | 07.07.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | SE | 07.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | IE | 22.11.2004 | LU | 22.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
CY | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 22.11.2004 | ||
LU | 22.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
IE | 22.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3117691 (WILLIAMS HAROLD W) [A] 1-10 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0551557 (KOOPMANN WILHELM KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 22 - line 36; figure -; claim 1 *; | [AY]EP0574107 (RISDON CORP [US]) [A] 1-8,10 * figures 5,6; claim 7 * [Y] 9; | [A]EP0839471 (LIR FRANCE SA [FR]) [A] 8* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9836985 (SHEFFLER ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * figures 12-20; claims 1,19 *; | [XY]EP0861613 (LAFFON SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,5,7,10 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 31; figures 3-7 * [Y] 9 |