EP1300079 - Cooking apparatus with device for measuring moisture and method for measuring moisture in a cooking apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MKN Maschinenfabrik Kurt Neubauer GmbH & Co. Halberstädter Strasse 2 38300 Wolfenbüttel / DE | [2007/22] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Kurt Neubauer GmbH & Co Halberstädter Strasse 2 38300 Wolfenbüttel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauser, Günther, Prof. Dr. Oberer Triftweg 33 38640 Goslar / DE | 02 /
Helm, Peter Juliusstrasse 2 38300 Wolfenbüttel / DE | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2008/39] |
Former [2003/15] | Einsel, Martin, et al Patentanwälte, Einsel & Kollegen, Jasperallee 1a 38102 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022196.6 | 04.10.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | DE2001148709 | 06.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10148709 | [2003/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300079 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300079 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300079 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A21B3/04 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
A21B3/04 (EP);
G01N29/036 (EP);
G01N2291/014 (EP);
G01N2291/02818 (EP);
G01N2291/02845 (EP);
G01N2291/02881 (EP);
G01N2291/0421 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/15] | Title | German: | Gargerät mit Feuchtemesseinrichtung und Verfahren zur Feuchtemessung in einem Gargerät | [2003/15] | English: | Cooking apparatus with device for measuring moisture and method for measuring moisture in a cooking apparatus | [2003/15] | French: | Appareil de cuisson avec un dispositif pour la mesure d'humidité et procédé pour la mesure d'humidité dans un appareil de cuisson | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 25.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.06.2007 | CZ | 27.06.2007 | DK | 27.06.2007 | EE | 27.06.2007 | FI | 27.06.2007 | GB | 27.06.2007 | IE | 27.06.2007 | IT | 27.06.2007 | NL | 27.06.2007 | SK | 27.06.2007 | TR | 27.06.2007 | BG | 27.09.2007 | SE | 27.09.2007 | GR | 28.09.2007 | AT | 04.10.2007 | LU | 04.10.2007 | ES | 08.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | PT | 27.11.2007 | FR | 22.02.2008 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
AT | 04.10.2007 | ||
LU | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
AT | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
AT | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
IT | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 27.06.2007 | |
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | SE | 27.09.2007 | |
ES | 08.10.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 27.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE906023 (NORBERT KURT ENDELL DIPL ING); | [A]US5689060 (MATSUSHIMA HARUO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4141768 | EP0386862 | EP0517433 | DE4206845 | US5689062 | EP0701388 | DE20013489U |