EP1302860 - Device for resetting circuits connected to a bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundig Multimedia B.V. De Boelelaan 7 Off. I 2hg 1083 HJ Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Grundig Multimedia B.V. De Boelelaan 7 Off. I 2hg 1083HJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft Beuthener Strasse 41 90471 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Horst Weinzierleiner Strasse 5 90449 Nürnberg / DE | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Pröll, Jürgen GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft R-L 1, Patentabteilung Beuthener Strasse 41 90471 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Pröll, Jürgen GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft, R-L 1, Patentabteilung, Beuthener Strasse 41 90471 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022199.0 | 04.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | DE2001150418 | 11.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10150418 | [2003/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302860 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302860 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
G06F13/4291 (EP);
G06F1/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Rücksetzen von an einen Bus angeschlossenen integrierten Schaltungen | [2003/16] | English: | Device for resetting circuits connected to a bus | [2003/16] | French: | Dispositif de remise en état initial des circuits intégrés connectés à un bus | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 22.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 15.12.2004 | CZ | 15.12.2004 | EE | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | IE | 15.12.2004 | SK | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | [2018/36] |
Former [2018/28] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
PT | 15.05.2005 | ||
Former [2008/03] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
PT | 15.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
EE | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
SK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
CZ | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2268817 (INTEGRATED MICRO PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-9 * page 39, line 37 - page 42, line 7 * * figure 12 *; | [A] - The I2C-bus specification, PHILIPS SEMICONDUCTORS, (20000131), XP002229462 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |