EP1300812 - Vending machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.A.S. International S.p.A. Via Lago di Vico, 60 36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adriani, Adriano Via M. Sanudo, 6 36015 Schio (Prov. of Vicenza) / IT | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02022283.2 | 07.10.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | IT2001VR00054 | 05.10.2001 Original published format: IT VR20010054 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300812 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300812 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07F11/00, G07F11/26, G07F11/32, G07F11/16, G07F11/02, G07F11/42, G07F11/38 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
G07F11/42 (EP);
G07F11/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/15] | G07F11/00, G07F11/02, G07F11/16, G07F11/26, G07F11/38, G07F11/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/43] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verkaufsautomat | [2003/15] | English: | Vending machine | [2003/15] | French: | Distributeur | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 29.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 09.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4834263 (BECZE THOMAS [US]) [A] 15-29* column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 4; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0866430 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-29 * column 4, line 10 - line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5881911 (BURDETTE CRYSTAL GAYE [US], et al) [X] 1-11,28,29 * column 3, line 4 - line 48 * * column 4, line 39 - line 48 * * column 6, line 26 - line 63 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2001000609 (RUDICK ARTHUR G [US], et al) [X] 1-15,28,29 * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0160] * * figures 1,3A,25-28,35-39 *; | [X]US6286715 (ZIESEL LAWRENCE B [US], et al) [X] 1-11,28,29 * column 4, line 50 - line 67 * * column 6, line 40 - line 50 * * column 9, line 3 - column 11, line 46 * * column 12, line 59 - column 13, line 17 * * figures 1,2 * |