Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
06.06.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
30.05.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
30.05.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
04.04.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.03.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.02.2008 | Change - English title | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
08.11.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.11.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.11.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.12.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
28.12.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
10.11.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.09.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
13.08.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
12.12.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
07.03.2003 | Change - inventor | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
21.02.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |