EP1300632 - Gas burner with flame monitoring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/15] | Gas burner with flame monitoring | ||
[2008/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rehfuss, Herbert Schwarzwaldstrasse 25 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 02 /
Pfotzer, Reinhold Via Bodoni 1 10045 Piossasco / IT | [2003/17] |
Former [2003/15] | 01 /
Rehfuss, Herbert Schwarzwaldstrasse 25 73760 Ostfildern / DE | ||
02 /
Pfotzer, Reinhold Lomuehlgasse 5 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022403.6 | 04.10.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | DE2001149383 | 06.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10149383 | [2003/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300632 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300632 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300632 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/72, F23N5/12 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
F23D14/725 (EP);
F23N5/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/43] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gasbrenner mit einer Flammenüberwachung | [2003/15] | English: | Gas burner with flame monitoring device | [2008/14] | French: | Brûleur à gaz avec un dispositif de surveillance de flamme | [2003/15] |
Former [2003/15] | Gas burner with flame monitoring | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0728991 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19539568 (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19854824 (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10003819 (HONEYWELL BV [NL]) [A] 1* the whole document * |