EP1300581 - Resonance box for sound pressure level modulation for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2012/10] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiga, Takao c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-Shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2011/40] |
Former [2003/15] | 01 /
Shiga, Takao Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2500 Shingai Iwata-Shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022444.0 | 04.10.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | JP20010308431 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001308431 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300581 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300581 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300581 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/12 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
F02M35/1222 (EP,US);
F01N1/02 (EP,US);
F01N13/02 (EP,US);
F02M35/1255 (EP,US);
F02M35/14 (EP,US);
F01N3/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/15] | Title | German: | Resonanzbehälter zur Druckwellenabstimmung für Brennkraftmaschinen | [2003/15] | English: | Resonance box for sound pressure level modulation for internal combustion engines | [2003/15] | French: | Boîte résonance destinée à moduler le niveau de pression acoustique pour moteurs à combustion interne | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2012
11.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE MANN + HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstr. 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2012
11.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE MANN + HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstr. 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | 15.01.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.06.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | IT | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | GB | 04.10.2012 | IE | 04.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | FR | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2022/27] |
Former [2013/40] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
GB | 04.10.2012 | ||
IE | 04.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
GB | 04.10.2012 | ||
IE | 04.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 04.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 07.03.2012 | |
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS57135212 ; | [X]JPS5888453 ; | [A]EP0379926 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-6,10 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 3 ** column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 8; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9740264 (MEUSEN WILHELMUS LAMBERTUS ARN [NL]) [X] 1-3,7-10 * page 6, line 3 - page 9, line 3; figures 1,1A,1B,5,6 *; | [X]EP0889228 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 29; figures 2-4 * * column 7, line 27 - line 37; figure 16 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 4; figure 18 *; | [X]US6105716 (MOREHEAD CLYDE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,11 * column 5, line 15 - line 23; figure 2 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 12; figure 7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821125), vol. 006, no. 236, Database accession no. (M - 173), & JP57135212 A 19820820 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN; others: 0J) [X] 1-3,7,9,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830816), vol. 007, no. 187, Database accession no. (M - 236), & JP58088453 A 19830526 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * |