EP1273920 - Apparatus for analysis with means for automatic introduction of reference fluid for the apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radiometer Medical ApS Aakandevej 21 2700 Broenshoej / DK | [2005/50] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states RADIOMETER MEDICAL A/S Aakandevej 21 2700 Broenshoej / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spork, Allan Skovbovej 10 2800 Lyngby / DK | 02 /
Pedersen, Bent Egelovsvej 6B 2830 Virum / DK | 03 /
Fremming, Niels Mosebyvej 31 2730 Herlev / DK | 04 /
Hvidtfeldt, Kristian Jacob Uglevangen 36 2830 Virum / DK | [2003/02] | Application number, filing date | 02022484.6 | 29.08.1996 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | DK19950000964 | 30.08.1995 Original published format: DK 96495 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1273920 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1273920 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/10, B01L3/00, G01N33/49, G01N33/487 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/4925 (EP,US);
Y10T436/119163 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2003/02] | Title | German: | Analysevorrichtung mit Mittel zur automatischen Einführung eines Referenzfluids | [2003/02] | English: | Apparatus for analysis with means for automatic introduction of reference fluid for the apparatus | [2003/02] | French: | Dispositif d'analyse avec moyen d'introduction automatique d'un fluide de référence | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/05] | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/05] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96928349.8 / EP0847531 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960928349) is 11.06.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2003 | 31.08.2011 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3676076 (GRADY DENNIS R) [A] 1,12 * abstract *; | [A]US4912986 (MARSONER HERMANN [AT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5151184 (FERKANY MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0557828 (HORIBA LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE4323666 (NOVEMBAL IMBALLAGGI SRL [IT]) [A] 1,12 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5417121 (ANDERSEN JOERGEN [DK], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US5293770 |