EP1302660 - Cooling of electrical driven pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shigeru c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022584.3 | 08.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | JP20010311522 | 09.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001311522 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1302660 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1302660 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302660 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/12, F04B1/20, F04B53/08 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
F04B1/2014 (EP,US);
F04B1/128 (EP,US);
F04B53/08 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [2005/51] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pumpaggregat mit einer Antriebskühlung mittels der zu fördernden Flüssigkeit | [2003/16] | English: | Cooling of electrical driven pump | [2003/16] | French: | Ensemble pompe et moteur refroidie par le liquide pompé | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0988807 ; | [A]US1800833 (HUFF LYMAN C) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0962654 (HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP1024287 (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [X] 1-24 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036]; figure 2 *; | [A]US6290473 (THOME LOTHAR [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 21 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09088807 A 19970331 (YUKEN KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0457693 | JPH0988807 |