EP1407772 - Pharmaceutical composition comprising porous spherical carbonaceous substance and its use for the treatment of renal and liver diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kureha Corporation 3-3-2, Nihonbashi-Hamacho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Kureha Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 9-11, Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamato, Hideyuki 24-21, Takenotsuka 5-chome, Adachi-ku Tokyo 121-0813 / JP | 02 /
Mitsuhashi, Satoshi c/o Kurha Corporation,3-3-2,Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | 03 /
Ise, Michihito c/o Kureha Corporation, 3-3-2, Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | 04 /
Hayashi, Haruhisa 3-32-4-1002, Akatsukashinmachi, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 175-0093 / JP | [2006/32] |
Former [2004/16] | 01 /
Yamato, Hideyuki 24-21, Takenotsuka 5-chome, Adachi-ku Tokyo 121-0813 / JP | ||
02 /
Mitsuhashi, Satoshi 104, Raionzumanshon Omiyasakuragi-cho 4-590 Sakuragi-cho, Saitama 331-0852 / JP | |||
03 /
Ise, Michihito, Kureha Chemical Industry co., Ltd. 9-11, Nihonbashi Horidome-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | |||
04 /
Hayashi, Haruhisa 3-32-4-1002, Akatsukashinmachi, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 175-0093 / JP | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022633.8 | 09.10.2002 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407772 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1407772 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1407772 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/44, A61P1/16, A61P13/12 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/16] | A61K31/44, A61P1/16, A61P13/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zubereitung enthaltend poröse sphärische kohlenstoffhaltige Teilchen und deren Verwendung zur Behandlung von Leber- und Nierenerkrankungen | [2004/19] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition comprising porous spherical carbonaceous substance and its use for the treatment of renal and liver diseases | [2004/16] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique contenant des particules de carbone sphériques et son utilisation pour le traitement des maladies rénales et hépatiques | [2006/11] |
Former [2004/16] | Pharmaceutische Zusammensetzung die Sphärischen Kolhlenhydratpartikelen enthäl, und ihre Verwendung zur Behandlung von Leber und Nierenekrankungen | ||
Former [2004/16] | Composition pharmaceutique contenant de particules de carbone spheriques et son utilisation pour le traitement des maladies renales et hepatiques | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.08.2006 | EE | 09.08.2006 | SK | 09.08.2006 | TR | 09.08.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 09.11.2006 | GR | 10.11.2006 | PT | 09.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | EE | 09.08.2006 | |
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
TR | 09.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 09.08.2006 | |
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | SK | 09.08.2006 | |
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | SK | 09.08.2006 | |
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | IT | 09.08.2006 | |
SK | 09.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | SK | 09.08.2006 | |
BG | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/12] | BG | 09.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2053176 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US4681764 (ENDO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 3, lines 54-65 * * claim 1 * * column 2, lines 27-33,50-56 * * column 1, lines 60-64 *; | [A]US4761284 (NISHIMURA YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]EP0595715 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 1, lines 40,53-55 * * page 3, lines 44-49; example 1; claim - *; | [X]EP0711561 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 4, lines 18-36; example -; claim - * * column 2, lines 16-26 *; | [X]US5573761 (ISE MICHIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 3, lines 51-58 * * column 4, lines 24-29; example -; claim - *; | [E]EP1249241 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, lines 18-23 * * page 11, line 43 - page 12, line 57 * * page 13, line 7 * * claims 1-5; table - * |