EP1407648 - Working tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müthing GmbH & Co. KG Winterberg, Wiesenstrasse 35 59955 Winterberg-Silbach / DE | For all designated states Schröder, Martin Raiffeisenstrasse 29 48346 Ostbevern / DE | [2004/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Martin c/o Schröder Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Raiffeisenstrasse 29 48346 Ostbevern / DE | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Lempert, Jost LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Lempert, Jost LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2004/16] | Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer.nat. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022741.9 | 11.10.2002 | [2004/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407648 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01B33/10, A01D34/535 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
A01D34/535 (EP);
A01B33/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Arbeitsgerät | [2004/16] | English: | Working tool | [2004/16] | French: | Outil de travail | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1140010 (INT HARVESTER CO) [Y] 4,10 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 36; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE2932635 (PATENT CONCERN NV) [X] 1-3 * page 10, line 1 - line 18 * * page 14, paragraph L; figures 1-6 * [Y] 4,8-11; | [Y]US5485718 (DALLMAN JIMMIE J [US]) [Y] 11* column 4, line 19 - line 34; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]DE29907727U (DUECKER GERHARD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * page 6, paragraph 1; figure 3 * |