EP1302958 - Seat valve for differential cylinder for electrical isolator switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAWE Hydraulik SE Streitfeldstrasse 25 81673 München / DE | [2009/05] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states HAWE Hydraulik GmbH & Co. KG Streitfeldstrasse 25 81673 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN Fabrik für Oel-Hydraulik GmbH & Co. KG Streitfeldstrasse 25 81673 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jemüller, Georg Kreillerstrasse 165 81825 München / DE | 02 /
Heusser, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Univ. Hellensteinstrasse 14 81245 München / DE | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022808.6 | 11.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | DE2001216920U | 15.10.2001 Original published format: DE 20116920 U | [2003/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302958 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302958 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/34, F15B13/042, F15B13/04 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
F16K31/426 (EP,US);
F15B13/0405 (EP,US);
F15B13/0431 (EP,US);
F16K11/0716 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | Sitzventil für den Differentialzylinder eines elektrischen Trennschalters | [2003/16] | English: | Seat valve for differential cylinder for electrical isolator switch | [2003/16] | French: | Soupape à siège pour vérin différentiel pour sectionneur | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 07.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | AT | 11.10.2010 | LU | 11.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GB | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
AT | 11.10.2010 | ||
LU | 11.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
AT | 11.10.2010 | ||
LU | 11.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
AT | 11.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
AT | 11.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
AT | 11.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GB | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | FI | 29.09.2010 | |
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 29.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR53004E (MAYBACH MOTORENBAU GMBH) [YD] 1-12 * page 1, column L, paragraph 2 *; | [DA]EP0074419 (HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DY]DE3345720 (BERINGER HYDRAULIK GMBH [CH]) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0373598 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [DE]) [AD] 1* column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 33 * |