EP1304484 - Vacuum pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koshizaka, Ryosuke K.K.TOYOTA Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kuramoto, Satoru K.K.TOYOTA Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Ida, Masahiro K.K.TOYOTA Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023201.3 | 16.10.2002 | [2003/17] | Priority number, date | JP20010318893 | 17.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001318893 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1304484 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1304484 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/10, F04C27/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
F04C28/06 (EP,US);
F04C27/009 (EP,US);
F04C2240/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vakuumpumpe | [2003/17] | English: | Vacuum pump | [2003/17] | French: | Pompe à vide | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1449257 (DRESSER IND) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0674106 (CHEMITEC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 7 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1006281 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) | by applicant | JPS63129829 | JPH0311193 |