EP1410715 - Combinations of aryloxyphenoxypropionates and safeners and their use for increasing weed control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt / DE | [2004/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hacker, Erwin Margarethensstr. 16 65239 Hochheim / DE | 02 /
Bieringer, Hermann Eichenweg 26 65817 Eppstein / DE | 03 /
Huff, Philipp Hans Eberlestrasse 18 65817 Eppstein / DE | 04 /
Willms, Lothar Königsteiner Strasse 50 65719 Hofheim / DE | [2004/17] | Application number, filing date | 02023436.5 | 19.10.2002 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1410715 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/76, A01N43/56 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/76, A01N2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/02] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aryloxyphenoxypropionate und Safener enthaltende Mittel und deren Verwendung zur Erhöhung der Unkrautbekämpfung | [2004/17] | English: | Combinations of aryloxyphenoxypropionates and safeners and their use for increasing weed control | [2004/17] | French: | Mélanges d'aryloxyphénoxypropionates et de phytoprotecteurs et leur utilisation pour améliorer la lutte contre les mauvaises herbes | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9107874 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 14-18 *the whole document* [A] 1-13; | [XA]EP0533057 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 14-18 * column 2, line 12 - column 4, line 20 * * examples 3-5 * [A] 1-13; | [D]EP0635996 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) |