EP1353078 - Cylindrical pin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kramski GmbH Heilbronner Strasse 10 75179 Pforzheim / DE | [2003/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kramski, Wiestaw Leipziger Strasse 10 75217 Birkenfeld / DE | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Blumenröhr, Dietrich, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Blumenröhr, Dietrich Dipl.-Ing., et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023445.6 | 21.10.2002 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | DE2002116412 | 12.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10216412 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353078 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/02 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
F16B5/0275 (EP);
F16B19/02 (EP);
F16B5/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/42] | Title | German: | Zylinderstift | [2003/42] | English: | Cylindrical pin | [2003/42] | French: | Broche cylindrique | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/20] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3132557 (BAUER MYRON J) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]DE2045726 (MUELLER K) [X] 1-3,8,11 * page 2, paragraph 1; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US4130369 (WOJCIK THADDEUS A) [X] 1,2,4,8,11 * column 2, line 4 - line 13 * * column 2, line 27 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5362185 (HAACK JOHANNES [CH]) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [X]US5678444 (NAGAMORI HACHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,11 * column 1, line 12 - line 15 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 6; figure 2 * |