EP1310235 - Emulsifier-free cosmetic and dermatological sunscreen formulations comprising hydroxybenzophenones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göppel, Anja Olloweg 9 22527 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Koopmann, Sabine Eppendorfer Weg 169 20253 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Schulz, Jens, Dr. Königsberger Strasse 30a 22869 Schenefeld / DE | 04 /
Grotelüschen, Birgit König-Heinrich-Weg 57 22459 Hamburg / DE | [2003/20] | Application number, filing date | 02023510.7 | 22.10.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | DE2001155966 | 09.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10155966 | [2003/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310235 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310235 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP);
A61K8/0241 (EP);
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K8/25 (EP);
A61K8/26 (EP);
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/415 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/20] | Title | German: | Emulgatorfreie kosmetische und dermatologische Lichtschutzformulierungen mit einem Gehalt an Hydroxybenphenonen | [2003/20] | English: | Emulsifier-free cosmetic and dermatological sunscreen formulations comprising hydroxybenzophenones | [2003/20] | French: | Formulations cosmétiques et dermatologiques antisolaires sans émulsifiants contenant des hydroxybenzophénones | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/43] | Request for further processing for: | 01.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5776440 (FORESTIER SERGE [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,9,12 * column 1, paragraph 3; example 6; claims 1-5,9 *; | [Y]EP0992233 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * page 8, paragraph 84 - page 9, line 11 * * page 3, paragraph 22 - paragraph 23; claim - *; | [Y]EP1046391 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1092421 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * claims 1,8; table 1 *; | [A]CA2296625 (FALLIEN COSMECEUTICALS LTD [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [E]EP1285648 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [E] 1-7,9,12* examples 5.2,5.5; claim - *; | [E]EP1291007 (BASF AG [DE]) [E] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 19 * * sentence 26, paragraph 163 - sentence 27, paragraph 175; example -; claim - * |