EP1370102 - Method and system for communication routing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilhelm, Hartmut, Dr. Fürstenackerstrasse 38 81477 München / DE | [2003/50] | Application number, filing date | 02023550.3 | 22.10.2002 | [2003/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1370102 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04M3/42 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
H04W4/16 (EP);
H04M3/42229 (EP);
H04M2250/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/36] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Leiten von Kommunikation | [2003/50] | English: | Method and system for communication routing | [2003/50] | French: | Procédé et système d'acheminement de communication | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.07.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0152908 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,15,19-22,24,33,37 * page 5, line 14 - page 10, line 22 * * page 17, line 10 - page 19, line 28 *; | [X]US5353331 (EMERY MARK J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,15,19-24,26,27,33,37 * column 8, line 11 - line 29 * * column 10, line 1 - column 12, line 6 * * column 16, line 36 - column 17, line 12 * * column 17, line 41 - column 18, line 6 * * column 21, line 15 - column 23, line 53 *; | [X]WO9821911 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-4,6,11,15,19-22,24,29,33,37 * page 5, line 3 - page 10, line 13 *; | [X]EP0858233 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,19,25,37 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 7 *; | [X]US6128502 (WIZGALL MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13,15-24,28-31,33-37,39 * column 2, line 23 - column 5, line 14 *; | [X]WO0213562 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,14,15,19-22,24,27,32,33,37 * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 24 *; | [X]WO0223933 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,16,19-22,24,27,34,38 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - page 13, line 21 *; | [E]EP1278385 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [E] 1-4,6,11-13,15-22,24,29-31,33-37,39 * column 2, line 5 - line 55 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 17 ** column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 49 * |