EP1413520 - Sealing jaw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA 70, Avenue du Général Guisan 1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. 70, Avenue du Général Guisan 1009 Pully / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kupfer, Reinhard Am Grossberg 52 55130 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Palmquist, Roland Herrestadsvägen 16 232 54 Akarp / SE | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Weber, Roland, et al WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Weber, Roland, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Patentanwälte Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023851.5 | 24.10.2002 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413520 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1413520 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/22 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B65B51/227 (EP,US);
B65B51/22 (KR);
B29C65/3656 (EP,US);
B29C65/3668 (EP,US);
B29C65/368 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/232 (EP,US);
B29C66/3462 (EP);
B29C66/3472 (EP,US);
B29C66/4312 (EP,US);
B29C66/72321 (EP,US);
B29C66/7373 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
B29C66/81427 (EP,US);
B29C66/81429 (EP,US);
B29C66/81431 (EP,US);
B29C66/8167 (EP,US);
B29C66/8491 (EP,US);
B65B51/10 (KR);
B29C65/745 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
B29C66/81457 (EP,US);
B29C66/832 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2305/02 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0069 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2871/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2909/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | Siegelbacke | [2004/18] | English: | Sealing jaw | [2004/18] | French: | Mâchoire de scellement | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | BE | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | IE | 24.10.2006 | LU | 24.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | GB | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
LU | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GB | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GB | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GB | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
GB | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3549440 (ADCOCK EDMUND PHILIP, et al) [A] 5* column 3, line 13; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4704509 (HILMERSSON ANDERS [SE], et al) [Y] 12,13 * column 3, lines 55-61; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0484998 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6,11 * column 4, lines 33-50; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO0044625 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [Y] 5 * page 9, line 23 *; | [XY]US6167681 (YANO KEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,15,16 * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 3; figure 12 * [Y] 5,6,11-13 | by applicant | EP0936150 | WO0020279 |