EP1308245 - Chuck for simplified insertion of a tool shank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USH Schraubwerkzeugfabrik Ulrich SchmidtGmbH & Co. KG. Sterzenbacher Strasse 4 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states USH Schraubwerkzeugfabrik Ulrich SchmidtGmbH & Co. KG. Sterzenbacher Strasse 4 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Völkel, Hans Albert Hauptstrasse 142 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Uwe Am Witschenberg 10 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Füssel, Michael, et al Dr. Sturies, Eichler & Füssel Patentanwaltskanzlei Lönsstrasse 55 42289 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Füssel, Michael, et al Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55 42289 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023870.5 | 24.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | DE2001151894 | 24.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10151894 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308245 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308245 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B25B23/00, B23B31/107 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B25B23/0035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | Spannfutter zum vereinfachten Einsetzen eines Werkzeugschaftes | [2003/19] | English: | Chuck for simplified insertion of a tool shank | [2003/19] | French: | Mandrin de serrage pour l'insertion simplifiée d'une tige d'outil | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/38] | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.02.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3205063 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-5,11 * page 10 - page 12 * * figures 4,6,7 *; | [X]US5188378 (ERLENKEUSER GERD [DE]) [X] 12 * figure 3 * * column 3, line 7 - line 24 *; | [Y]GB2278303 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * page 7 * * page 9 - page 10 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US5474139 (ODENDAHL ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,11 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 30 * * figure 5 *; | [DY]DE19610213 (SCHMIDT ULRICH USH SCHRAUBWERK [DE]) [DY] 1-11 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 47 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE20106986U (WERNER HERMANN WERA WERKE [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 5 ** figures 1-6 * |