EP1350602 - Stone polishing pad containing cork powder and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SON, Shuk-dae BK Diamond Co., Ltd., 78-11, Dangjung-dong, Gunpo-si Gyunggi-do / KR | [2003/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023986.9 | 25.10.2002 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | KR20020018046 | 02.04.2002 Original published format: KR 2002018046 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/41] | KR20010018046 | 02.04.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350602 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1350602 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/00, B24D7/06, B24D3/34 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
B24D3/00 (EP,KR,US);
B24D3/344 (EP,US);
B24D7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Korkhaltiges Polierkissen zum Polieren von Stein und entsprechendes Herstellungsverfahren | [2003/41] | English: | Stone polishing pad containing cork powder and method for manufacturing the same | [2003/41] | French: | Tampon de polissage pour le travail la pierre contenant de la poudre de liège et procédé de manufacture | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 30.03.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1131752 (ZUCCO NOEL) [X] 1-5 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - line 34 * [Y] 6-8; | [XY]JPS59187468 ; | [YA]US6231629 (CHRISTIANSON TODD J [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * column 12, line 44 - line 50; figures 1,2 * [A] 4; | [XA]US5989114 (DONAHUE ALLEN THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 2 * [A] 4; | [A]SU1835422 (PROIZV OB EDINENIE VOLOGODSKIJ) [A] 3,10 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850306), vol. 009, no. 051, Database accession no. (M - 361), & JP59187468 A 19841024 (NIHON REJIBON SEITO KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [Y] 6-8 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 10, Database accession no. 073877 [ ] * abstract * |