EP1317088 - Method and apparatus for remote testing of optical cables using a test wavelength [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mumm, Alexander Quittenweg 1 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
Schroth, Albrecht Eberhardweg 12 71083 Herrenberg / DE | 03 /
Nill, Horst Bahnhofstrasse 47 72184 Eutingen / DE | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Barth, Daniel Mathias Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Hewlett-Packard-Strasse 8 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Barth, Daniel Mathias Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | Barth, Daniel c/o Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH, Patentabteilung, Herrenbergerstrasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024089.1 | 29.10.2002 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317088 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317088 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/08 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H04J14/0226 (EP,US);
H04B10/071 (EP,US);
H04J14/0246 (EP,US);
H04J14/025 (EP,US);
H04J14/0279 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/09] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Fernüberwachung von optischen Kabeln unter Verwendung einer Prüfwellenlänge | [2003/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for remote testing of optical cables using a test wavelength | [2003/23] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de test à distance de câbles optiques utilisant une longueur d'onde de test | [2003/23] |
Former [2003/23] | Verfahren und Anordnung zur entfernter Überwachung von optischen Kabeln unter Verwendung einer Prüfwellenlänge | Examination procedure | 28.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2739992 (GAY PHILIPPE [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 9 - line 11 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 19 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 11 *; | [AY]US5093568 (MAYCOCK JOHN [CA]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 8 - line 12 * * column 1, line 26 - line 39 * * column 3, line 8 - line 30 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 54 - line 59 * * column 5, line 22 - line 36 * * column 6, line 3 - line 6 * [Y] 6-8; | [A]EP0365371 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 44 - line 48 * * page 3, line 6 - line 18 * * claims 1,7 *; | [A]DE19830729 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 1, line 25 - line 27 * * column 1, line 52 - line 65 * * column 2, line 17 - line 43 * * column 4, line 17 - line 31 * * column 6, line 68 - column 7, line 11 * * claims 1,12 *; | [A]DE19933268 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3-6 * column 1, line 21 - line 23 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 33 - line 40 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0390320 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 26 - line 39 * * column 2, line 3 - line 13 * * column 2, line 42 - line 45 * * column 3, line 5 - line 17 * * column 3, line 43 - line 51 * * column 4, line 5 - line 8 * | [Y] - NOBUO TOMITA ET AL, "DESIGN AND PERFORMANCE OF A NOVEL AUTOMATIC FIBER LINE TESTING SYSTEM WITH OTDR FOR OPTICAL SUBSCRIBER LOOPS", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19940501), vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 717 - 725, XP000480092 [Y] 1-8 * page 717, par. II.A, line 7-10 * * page 717, par. II.B, line 7-10 * * page 718, left-hand column * * page 718, par. III.B, line 2-5 * * page 722, par. IV.A, line 3-6 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.293959 |