EP1308682 - Microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linn High Therm GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Platz 1 92275 Eschenfelden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Linn High Term GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Platz 1 92275 Eschenfelden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linn, Horst Heinrich-Hertz-Platz 1 92275 Eschenfelden / DE | 02 /
Suhm, Jürgen Kirchenweg 15 92275 Eschenfelden / DE | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024150.1 | 30.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | DE2001153944 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10153944 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308682 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308682 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F27B9/30, H05B6/76, F27D1/18 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
H05B6/763 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/19] | F27B9/30, H05B6/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | Mikrowellenofen | [2003/19] | English: | Microwave oven | [2003/19] | French: | Four à micro-ondes | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2958754 (HAHN DONALD E) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 15 - line 26 * * figure 4A *; | [A]GB1013398 (HIRST ELECTRONIC LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DA]DD120995 (BERNT KOCH, REICHENBACH, DE) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document * |