EP1308679 - Ejector for ejector cycle system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hotta, Tadashi, Nippon Soken, Inc. 14 Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-city, Aichi-pref, 445-0012 / JP | 02 /
Ozaki, Yukikatsu, Nippon Soken, Inc. 14 Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-city, Aichi-pref, 445-0012 / JP | 03 /
Ishikawa, Hiroshi Denso Corporation, Int. Prop. Dept., 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Hirotsugu Denso Corporation, Int. Prop. Dept., 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/19] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024426.5 | 29.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | JP20010332747 | 30.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001332747 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308679 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308679 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/00, F25B41/06 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
F04F5/04 (EP,US);
F25B41/00 (EP,US);
F25B41/30 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2341/0012 (EP,US);
F25B2500/01 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/27] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ejektor für Strahlkreislaufanordnung | [2003/19] | English: | Ejector for ejector cycle system | [2003/19] | French: | Ejecteur pour système à cycle d'ejection | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 15.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/27] | 16.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2859596 (EVANS DARL L) [X] 1,2,5 * column 5, line 40 - line 70; figure 3 * * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [XY]US4187695 (SCHUMACHER ERNEST W [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 40; figure 3 * * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [XY]FR2288892 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 38; figure 2 * * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [X]US6261067 (POPOV SERGUEI A [US]) [X] 3 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001020649 (MIQUEL PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 7,8,10 * paragraphs [0072] - [0080]; figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0487002 (THERMAL WAERME KAELTE KLIMA [DE]) [X] 7,8,10 * column 9, line 18 - line 31; figure 3 *; | [Y]JPH062964 ; | [A]JPH01196000 ; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940406), vol. 018, no. 196, Database accession no. (M - 1589), & JP06002964 A 19940111 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [Y] 6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891107), vol. 013, no. 489, Database accession no. (M - 888), & JP01196000 A 19890807 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 7-10 * abstract * | [A] - SUN D, "Solar powered combined ejector-vapour compression cycle for air conditioning and refrigeration", ENERGY CONVERSION AND MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, OXFORD, GB, (19970301), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0196-8904, pages 479 - 491, XP004017046 [A] 7-10 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0196-8904(96)00063-5 | [A] - CUNNINGHAM R G ET AL, "JET BREAKUP AND MIXING THROAT LENGTHS FOR THE LIQUID JET GAS PUMP", JOURNAL OF FLUIDS ENGINEERING, ASME, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19740901), vol. 96, no. 3, ISSN 0098-2202, pages 216 - 226, XP002033997 [A] 7-10 * figure 4 * |