Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
24.03.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] |
20.10.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.07.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |
22.10.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.03.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
14.03.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |