EP1309045 - A bulb socket and a method for mounting it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsuma, Takatoshi, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024516.3 | 30.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | JP20010332318 | 30.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001332318 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1309045 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309045 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R33/965 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H01R33/965 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [2004/05] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lampenfassung und deren Montage | [2003/19] | English: | A bulb socket and a method for mounting it | [2003/19] | French: | Socle pour lampe et montage | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 22.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DE, GB | 09.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.12.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6129443 (MURATA KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 11, line 1 - column 12, line 62; figure 1 *; | [X]US6039579 (PAUL DONALD C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4 - column 5; figure 1 *; | [A]DE1610933U (STAECKER WALTER [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 2 - page 3; figure 1 * |