EP1288979 - Manual control device for use in the health care sector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novar GmbH Albertstrasse 4-8 51643 Gummersbach / DE | [2005/09] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Albert Ackermann GmbH & Co. KG Albertstrasse 4-8 51643 Gummersbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gross, Johannes Gummarstrasse 53 51647 Gummersbach / DE | 02 /
Wegerhoff, Bernd Königsheider Weg 10 51709 Marienheide / DE | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024705.2 | 18.05.2000 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE1999123392 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19923392 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1288979 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1288979 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288979 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/02, H04M1/675 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H01H9/0214 (EP);
H01H2219/012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/10] | Title | German: | Hand-Bediengerät für den Pflegebereich | [2003/10] | English: | Manual control device for use in the health care sector | [2003/10] | French: | Appareil à commande manuelle utilisé dans le secteur des soins de santé | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00927215.4 / EP1181701 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Request for further processing for: | 09.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 09.10.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.03.2005 | CY | 18.05.2005 | BE | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | DK | 09.06.2005 | GR | 09.06.2005 | SE | 09.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/27] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
CY | 18.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
CY | 18.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0508063 (ACKERMANN ALBERT GMBH CO [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5237327 (SAITOH MITSUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2279784 (RICHARDS JOHN [GB], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0792726 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [YA]WO9809241 (HARLEY STREET SOFTWARE LTD [CA]) [Y] 1 * column 9, paragraph 4 - paragraph L; figure - * [A] 5 |