EP1333492 - Cooling a microchip on a circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | ||
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mueller, Marcus Muehlhaldenweg 11 71069 Sindelfingen / DE | 02 /
Zaiser, Jochen Gartenstrasse 5 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2003/32] | Barth, Daniel, et al c/o Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH, Patentabteilung, Herrenbergerstrasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024869.6 | 08.11.2002 | [2003/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1333492 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1333492 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/40 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
H01L23/4006 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4062 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4068 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4081 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/18] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrochip-Kühlung auf Leiterplatte | [2003/32] | English: | Cooling a microchip on a circuit board | [2003/32] | French: | Dissipation de chaleur d'une puce à micro-circuits sur un panneau à circuit | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3356904 (YONKERS WILLIAM A) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5089936 (KOJIMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]US5190097 (SELBY STEVEN F [US], et al) [A] 9 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5735340 (MIRA ALI [US], et al); | [Y]US5757621 (PATEL NARESH C [US]) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * figure - *; | [A]US6046905 (NELSON DARYL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US6444496 (EDWARDS DAVID L [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,10-15 * figure 5 *; | [A] - Research Disclosure, February 2001, pp.238-240, nr. 442 062, "Integral, structural, natural convection cooled heatsink", XP001103746 [A] * the whole document * | Examination | US5325265 |