blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1375266

EP1375266 - Device for protection of persons in case of a collision with a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACTS-Advanced Car Technology Systems GmbH & Co.KG
Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring
63877 Sailauf / DE
[2004/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Schreurs, Antoine
Eichendorffstrasse 11
63773 Goldbach / DE
02 / Goseberg, Frank
Pappelweg 39
63741 Aschaffenburg / DE
03 / Schmidt, Werner
Edelmannstrasse 33
63755 Alzenau / DE
04 / Ros, Manel Edo
Frohsinnstrasse 25
63739 Aschaffenburg / DE
 [2004/01]
Representative(s)Pfiz, Thomas, et al
Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB
Tübinger Strasse 26
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]Pfiz, Thomas, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02024890.208.11.2002
[2004/01]
Priority number, dateDE200115469309.11.2001         Original published format: DE 10154693
[2004/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1375266
Date:02.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1375266
Date:28.07.2004
[2004/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1375266
Date:14.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2004
ClassificationIPC:B60R21/34
[2004/01]
CPC:
B60R21/38 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/16]
Former [2004/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Personenaufprallschutz für ein Kraftfahrzeug[2004/01]
English:Device for protection of persons in case of a collision with a vehicle[2004/01]
French:Dispositif de protection de personnes en cas d'impact avec un véhicule[2004/01]
Examination procedure09.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/46]
29.01.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
20.05.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR
27.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2006Fee for grant paid
11.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.03.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
04.03.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200605   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2006
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT14.02.2007
ES25.05.2007
[2008/23]
Former [2007/39]ES25.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19706878  (AMANDI FRANZ D [DE]) [A] 1-23,30,31,35,36* column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 44; figure - *;
 [XAY]DE19712961  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8-14,16-22,35,36 * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,7,15,23,31 [Y] 30;
 [A]EP0926018  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1-23,30,31,35,36 * column 4, line 37 - column 10, line 35; figure - *;
 [Y]DE20105884U  (INNOTEC FORSCHUNGS & ENTW GMBH [DE]) [Y] 30 * page 10, line 7 - line 18; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.