EP1310384 - Vehicle tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2014/05] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Tadao, @Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2014/05] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
Matsumoto, Tadao, Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/20] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024938.9 | 06.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | JP20010343612 | 08.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001343612 | JP20010382061 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001382061 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310384 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310384 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1310384 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60C13/00 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
B60C13/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/07] |
Former [2003/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugreifen | [2003/20] | English: | Vehicle tire | [2003/20] | French: | Bandage pneumatique pour véhicule | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2004 | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4823856 (ROBERTS CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 5 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6032711 (BARRESE ANTONIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 31 - line 45 ** figures 2,6 * | Examination | US5303758 | US5645661 | WO0013922 |