EP1310792 - Apparatus and method for non-destructive inspection of concrete structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Shogo 8-12, Higashi-obayama-cho 4-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025122.9 | 08.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | JP20010346003 | 12.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001346003 | JP20020134489 | 09.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002134489 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310792 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310792 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/38, G01N27/60 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G01N22/02 (EP,US);
G01N21/95 (EP,US);
G01N33/383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/05] |
Former [2003/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur zerstörungsfreien Betonstrukturprüfung | [2003/20] | English: | Apparatus and method for non-destructive inspection of concrete structures | [2003/20] | French: | Procédé et appareil de contrôle non-destructif des structures en béton | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5051748 (PICHOT CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-22 * column A ** column 4, line 54 - column 7, line 29; figure 1 *; | [X]US5384543 (BIBLE DON W [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * column A * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 62; figure 1 *; | [A]US5963042 (SUYAMA KIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * column A * * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 57; figure 1 * | Examination | US5859535 |