EP1296235 - Dynamic device matching using driver candidate lists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLE INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states APPLE COMPUTER, INC. M/S 38-PAT, 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kathail, Pradeep 1580 S. Mary Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
Saultpaugh, Thomas E. 6938 Bret Harte Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
Knight Banks, Jano 6790 Mason Way San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 04 /
Hochsprung, Ron 18467 Las Cumbres Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | [2003/33] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
Katail, Pradeep 3450 Granada Avenue 50 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
02 /
Saultpaugh, Thomas E. 6938 Bret Harte Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | |||
03 /
Knight Banks, Jano 6790 Mason Way San Jose, CA 95129 / US | |||
04 /
Hochsprung, Ron 18467 Las Cumbres Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | Representative(s) | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02025174.0 | 03.05.1996 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | US19950435676 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: US 435676 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1296235 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1296235 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296235 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
G06F9/4411 (EP,US);
G06F13/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/13] | Title | German: | Dynamische Geräteerkennung unter Verwendung von Treiber-Kandidatenlisten | [2003/13] | English: | Dynamic device matching using driver candidate lists | [2003/13] | French: | Reconnaissance dynamique de dispositifs à l'aide de listes de pilotes candidats | [2008/11] |
Former [2003/13] | Reconnaissance dynamique de dispositifs à l'aide de listes de pilots candidates | Examination procedure | 31.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96915495.4 / EP0774137 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2003 | 31.05.2004 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0521673 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 15 * * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 30 * * column 7, line 39 - line 55 * * column 8, line 29 * * column 10, line 52 * * claims 1-3,6,7 * * figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]EP0552873 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 11 * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 53 * * column 4, line 38 - line 45 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 14 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 4 * * figures 2,5-7 *; | [A]EP0584909 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,16* claims 1,3,4,12 * |