EP1338571 - Waste water treatment unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMS Verwaltungs- und Beteiligungs GmbH Adolfsallee 27-29 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2003/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adelhütte, Hugo Bornwiesweg 27 65388 Schlangenbad / DE | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025210.2 | 12.11.2002 | [2003/35] | Priority number, date | DE2002120256 | 06.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10220256 | HU20010004920 | 14.11.2001 Original published format: HU 0104920 | [2003/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1338571 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, B01D21/24 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
C02F3/286 (EP);
B01D21/0018 (EP);
B01D21/10 (EP);
B01D21/2405 (EP);
B01D21/2427 (EP);
B01D21/245 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B01D21/0018, B01D21/10, B01D21/2405, B01D21/245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CZ, ES, PT, SK [2004/21] |
Former [2003/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kläreinheit | [2003/35] | English: | Waste water treatment unit | [2003/35] | French: | Unité d'épuration d'eau | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 28.02.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, SE, TR | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/52] | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07222975 ; | [XA]US3533508 (SEIPP JURGEN, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 6 - line 54; figure 1 * [A] 22; | [X]US3828933 (HAMPTON Q, et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 48 - column 7, line 6; figure 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07222975 A 19950822 (TETSUO NISHIDA) [X] 1 * abstract * |