EP1319457 - Method of cutting substantially cylindrical internally or externally toothed gears [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLEASON-PFAUTER, Maschinenfabrik GmbH Daimlerstrasse 14 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2008/19] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states GLEASON-PFAUTER, Maschinenfabrik GmbH Daimlerstrasse 14 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fahrer, Siegfried Kastenienweg 15 71726 Benningen a/.N. / DE | 02 /
Peiffer, Klaus, Dr. Kirchstrasse 24 71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
Faulstich, Ingo, Dr. Mundelsheimber Strasse 10 71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | Kohl, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025260.7 | 13.11.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | DE20011062823 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10162823 | [2003/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1319457 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1319457 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1319457 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1319457 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23F23/10 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B23F23/10 (EP,US);
Y10T409/103975 (EP,US);
Y10T409/10477 (EP,US);
Y10T409/10795 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/25] | B23F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum spanenden Bearbeiten im wesentlichen zylindrischer, innen- oder aussenverzahnter Zahnräder | [2003/25] | English: | Method of cutting substantially cylindrical internally or externally toothed gears | [2003/25] | French: | Procédé d'usinage de roues dentées essentiellement cylindriques à denture intérieure ou extérieure | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2009
18.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Höfler Maschinenbau GmbH Industriestrasse 19 76275 Ettlingen / DE Opponent's representative Mischung, Ralf, et al, et al Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstraße 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2009
Höfler Maschinenbau GmbH Industriestrasse 19 76275 Ettlingen / DE Opponent's representative Mischung, Ralf, et al, et al Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | 13.03.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.09.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.11.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.02.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.02.2011 | Appeal received No. T0531/11 | 26.04.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.11.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 28.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | IE | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | LU | 13.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | AT | 13.11.2009 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
TR | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
AT | 13.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
LU | 13.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | CZ | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | NL | 07.05.2008 | |
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | NL | 07.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3712454 (WERKZEUGMASCH OKT VEB [DD]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6; | [XA]DE19631620 (DICK ALBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-6; | [A] - SPUR G ET AL, "RECHNERUNTERSTUETZTE FEHLERKOMPENSATION AN CNC-SCHLEIFMASCHINEN", ZWF ZEITSCHRIFT FUR WIRTSCHAFTLICHE FERTIGUNG UND AUTOMATISIERUNG, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19930901), vol. 88, no. 9, ISSN 0947-0085, pages 375 - 377, XP000396519 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | Opposition | DE1943558 | - "SINUMERIK 840D/840Di" Funktionsbeschreibung der Firma Siemens (Ausgabe 10.2000) | - I. N. BRONSTEIN ET AL., Taschenbuch der Mathematik, FRANKFURT/MAIN, VERLAG HARRI DEUTSCH, (1979), vol. 19, pages 266 - 269 | - "Raum- oder Gelenkkoordinaten - Konvertierungsalgorithmen von Orientierungsbeschreibungen", ZENTRALSCHWEIZERISCHEN TECHNIKUMS LUZERN, (199501), pages 1 - 3 | - W. LOTZE, Zahnradmessung mit Koordinatenmessgeräten, (1987), pages 14,89 - 114,115 | - Pfauter presents a new generation of CNC Profile Grinding Machines | - Zahnrad-Profilschleifmaschinen ZP 06 / ZP 08, vierseitiger Firmenprospekt der Firma Niles, Berlin, mit Angebotsunterlagen aus dem Jahr 1999 und einer Referenzliste | - Angebotsschreiben der Einsprechenden vom 18. Oktober 2001 mit Zeichnung als Anlage für eine Promat 700S | - Maschinenbedienung, 5.3 Prozess-Menü, Bedienungsanleitung der Einsprechenden fürdie Maschine Promat 700S, nachveröffentlicht | - Maschinenbedienung, 5.2 Datenverwaltungs-Menü, Bedienungsanleitung der Einsprechenden für die Maschine Promat 700S, nachveröffentlicht | - Helix 400 / Promat 400, Ausführungsvarianten, Standard und kk, Firmenprospekt der Einsprechenden, nachveröffentlicht 4/2005 | - Helix 700, Ausführungsvarianten Promat, Standard und kk, Firmenprospekt der Einsprechenden, nachveröffentlicht 4/2005 | - Fräsen von Turbinenschaufen mit Siemens 840D Präsentation eines Applikationsprojekts bei den Firmen Dr. Hagen / Lappersdorf und GEC ALSTHOM / Nürnberg vom 05.06.1996 |