EP1312955 - Process for coupling optical fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO. LTD. 5-15 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8335 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO. LTD. 5-15 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8335 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Kyoichi, Technical Research Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | 02 /
Kawase, Ritsu, Technical Research Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Masayoshi, Technical Research Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Tatsushi, Technical Research Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | [2003/27] |
Former [2003/21] | 01 /
Sasaki, Kyoichi, Technical Research Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | ||
02 /
Kawse, Ritsu, Technical Research Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | |||
03 /
Suzuki, Masayoshi, Technical Research Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | |||
04 /
Kobayashi, Tatsushi, Technical Research Lab. Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0192 / JP | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025521.2 | 13.11.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | JP20010349610 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001349610 | JP20020053484 | 28.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002053484 | JP20020266587 | 12.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002266587 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312955 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312955 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/3809 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (KR);
G02B6/3885 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/07] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode zur Kopplung optischer Fasern | [2003/21] | English: | Process for coupling optical fibres | [2003/21] | French: | Procédé de couplage pour des fibres optiques | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS56114914 ; | [AD]JPH11264914 ; | [A]JPH11160580 ; | [A]US3923371 (DALGLEISH JACK FRANK) [A] 1-18* column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 6; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4969705 (STOY VLADIMIR A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 62 *; | [A]US5377289 (JOHNSON MELVIN H [US], et al) [A] 2,4 * column 16, line 37 - line 64 *; | [A]US5649038 (BONIORT JEAN-YVES [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]US2001001623 (INADA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure 1A * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811205), vol. 005, no. 191, Database accession no. (P - 092), & JP56114914 A 19810909 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE CORP ; FURUKAWA ELECTRIC) [X] 1-5,10,11 * abstract * [A] 6-9,12-18 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11264914 A 19990928 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH &TELEPHONE CORP) [AD] 3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11160580 A 19990618 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |