EP1315338 - Network transfer system and transfer method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Hiroshi, Nec Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/22] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025639.2 | 19.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | JP20010355448 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001355448 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315338 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1315338 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
H04L45/502 (EP,US);
H04L69/14 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/40] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Netzübertragungssystem und Übertragungsverfahren | [2003/22] | English: | Network transfer system and transfer method | [2003/22] | French: | Système de transfert de réseau et méthode de transfert | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - VACH KOMPELLA SUNIL KHANDEKAR NICK TINGLE TIMETRA NETWORKS GILES HERON PACKETEXCHANGE JUHA HEINANEN SONG NETWORKS TOM S C SOON SBC, "Virtual Private Switched Network Services over an MPLS Network; draft-vkompella-ppvpn-vpsn-mpls-00.txt;", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20010713), ISSN 0000-0004, pages 1 - 12, XP015036554 [X] 1-6,14-16,19,22 * page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 19 * | [A] - LUCA MARTINI NASSER EL-AAWAR LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS ET AL, "Encapsulation Methods for Transport of Layer 2 Frames Over IP and MPLS Networks; draft-martini-l2circuit-encap-mpls-03.txt;", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200107), no. 3, ISSN 0000-0004, pages 1 - 17, XP015032131 [A] 6,15,16,22 * page 3, line 32 - line 35 * | [A] - REKHTER T J WATSON RESEARCH CENTER Y ET AL, "A Border Gateway Protocol 4 (BGP-4); rfc1771.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (199503), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015007558 [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 19 - line 25 * |