EP1315111 - Service system, terminal, service server, and computer program for electronic commerce [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0000 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morioka, Mikio 20-5-608, Higashi-Rokugo, 2-Chome, Oota-ku Tokyo 144-0046 / JP | 02 /
Uranaka, Sachiko 13-8, Honkomagome 3-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | 03 /
Kageyama, Mitsuhiro 24-19, Kamisuna-cho 5-chome Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo 190-0032 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Mitsuhiro 11-11, Miyanosato 4-chome Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0216 / JP | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025862.0 | 19.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | JP20010354803 | 20.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001354803 | JP20020325783 | 08.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002325783 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315111 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1315111 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/22] | Title | German: | Service System, Terminal, Service Server, und Computerprogramm für e-Commerce | [2003/22] | English: | Service system, terminal, service server, and computer program for electronic commerce | [2003/22] | French: | Systeme, terminal, server et programme informatique pour commerce éléctronique | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0023864 (LANG BROOK [US]) [X] 1,3,10,11,15,18-23 * page 4, line 20 - page 6, line 25 *; | [A]WO0070504 (HERZ FREDERICK [US]) [A] 3,10 * page 3, line 13 - line 16 * * page 11, line 1 - line 27 *; | [A]WO0104806 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 9,14,16 * page 7, line 7 - line 17 *; | [A]WO0154034 (ANGARA E COMMERCE SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,10,18-23* abstract *; | [X]WO0175680 (GLOBAL GRANNY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 12 - page 26, paragraph 1 * * page 39, paragraph 2 - page 42, paragraph 1 *; | [XA]WO0182201 (SGARAGLINO VITO [US]) [X] 1,3,10,11,18-23 * page 13, line 1 - line 16 * * page 29, line 15 - page 30, line 15 * * page 43, line 8 - page 44, line 5 * [A] 2,4 |