blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1318090

EP1318090 - Paper feeding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2007
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd.
1-1, Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome, Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku
Kyoto 602-8585 / JP
[2006/39]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd.
1-1, Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome, Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku
Kyoto 602-8585 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirai, Keisuke
1-1 Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome
Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto602-8585 / JP
02 / Takeuchi, Masahiko
1-1 Tenjinkitamachi, Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome
Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto602-8585 / JP
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Kilian, Helmut
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner
Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Kilian, Helmut, Dr.
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date02025879.419.11.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateJP2001037114605.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001371146
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318090
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1318090
Date:12.05.2004
[2004/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318090
Date:27.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:B65H1/04
[2003/24]
CPC:
B65H1/04 (EP,US); B65H2405/1116 (EP,US); B65H2511/17 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US); B65H2801/21 (EP,US)
C-Set:
B65H2511/17, B65H2220/03 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/11 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/05]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Papierzuführvorrichtung[2003/24]
English:Paper feeding apparatus[2003/24]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation de papier[2003/24]
Examination procedure12.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/42]
07.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2006Fee for grant paid
07.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.09.2006
GB27.12.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]GB27.12.2006
FR25.05.2007
Former [2007/51]GB27.12.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0812099  ;
 [A]JPS5978013  ;
 [X]DE532292  (KOENIG WERK G M B H MASCHF) [X] 1,2,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE547205  (KOENIG WERK G M B H MASCHF) [X] 1-3,7,8,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3355167  (RCEVES HUDSON D) [X] 1-4,7,8,11 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 5; figure - *;
 [X]EP0189746  (GIBEN IMPIANTI SPA [IT]) [X] 1,8 * figure - *;
 [A]GB2204301  (NAUTILUS MODELS LIMITED);
 [X]DE4216627  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11 * column 1, line 21 - line 34 * * column 2, line 32 - column 2, line 60 * * column 3, line 6 - line 10; figure -; claim - *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08012099 A 19960116 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840830), vol. 008, no. 189, Database accession no. (M - 321), & JP59078013 A 19840504 (KINSEISHIYA:KK) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.