EP1321919 - ADHESIVE LABEL, METHOD OF MANUFACTURE AND ITS UTILISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/26] | Adhesive label, method of manufacture and its utilisation | ||
[2015/23] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bandfix AG Industriestrasse 19 8962 Bergdietikon / CH | [2012/51] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states tesa SE Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states tesa AG Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheubner, Thomas Am Käferhölzle 6 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2012/51] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2011/25] | Stubbe, Andreas Tesa SE Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | Stubbe, Andreas tesa AG Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025966.9 | 21.11.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | DE20011063589 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10163589 | [2003/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1321919 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1321919 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1321919 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10, G09F3/02 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
G09F3/02 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
Y10S428/915 (EP,US);
Y10S428/916 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/26] | G09F3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/26] | Title | German: | SELBSTKLEBEND AUSGERÜSTETE ETIKETTEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESER SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2015/23] | English: | ADHESIVE LABEL, METHOD OF MANUFACTURE AND ITS UTILISATION | [2015/23] | French: | ÉTIQUETTE AUTO-ADHÉSIVE, MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2015/23] |
Former [2003/26] | Selbstklebend ausgerüstete Etiketten, Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser sowie ihre Verwendung | ||
Former [2003/26] | Adhesive label, method of manufacture and its utilisation | ||
Former [2003/26] | Etiquette auto-adhesive, méthode de fabrication et son utilisation | Examination procedure | 23.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07108135.0 / EP1818893 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Pago Etikettiersysteme GmbH Gutenbergstrasse 9 72631 Aichtal-Aich / DE Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Dr. Ing. Peter Riebling Rennerle 10 Postfach 3160 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Pago Etikettiersysteme GmbH Gutenbergstrasse 9 72631 Aichtal-Aich / DE Opponent's representative Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Dr. Ing. Peter Riebling Rennerle 10 Postfach 3160 D-88113 Lindau / DE | 04.07.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.02.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.01.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/19] | Appeal following opposition | 01.04.2011 | Appeal received No. T0769/11 | 31.05.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.02.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: closure of the opposition procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.08.2007 | CZ | 22.08.2007 | DK | 22.08.2007 | EE | 22.08.2007 | FI | 22.08.2007 | IE | 22.08.2007 | NL | 22.08.2007 | SK | 22.08.2007 | TR | 22.08.2007 | AT | 21.11.2007 | LU | 21.11.2007 | BG | 22.11.2007 | SE | 22.11.2007 | GR | 23.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | IT | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | ES | 03.12.2007 | PT | 22.01.2008 | DE | 01.06.2013 | GB | 21.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/34] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
TR | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LU | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
IT | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
TR | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LU | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
IT | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
TR | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LU | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
IT | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
TR | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LU | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/37] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 21.11.2007 | ||
LU | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
AT | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 22.08.2007 | |
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 22.08.2007 | |
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 22.08.2007 | |
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 03.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3301728 (WILLIAM SWARTZ) [Y] 5,6* column 2, line 4 - line 7 *; | [XY]DE2613131 (SCHROEDER KARL DR) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 3; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,6; | [XY]US4557505 (SCHAEFER RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 26; figures 1-3 * [Y] 5,6; | [XY]EP0404402 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * page 3, line 53 - page 5, line 10; figure 1a * [Y] 5,6 |