EP1314556 - Sheet delivering device for a sheet-processing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2003/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinborn, Tilo Questerberger Weg 28 01682 Meissen / DE | 02 /
Koch, Michael Weinbergstrasse 76c 01462 Cossebaude / DE | 03 /
Zimmermann, Hans Am Sebnitzbach 4 01855 Sebnitz / DE | [2003/22] | Application number, filing date | 02025998.2 | 21.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | DE2001157117 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10157117 | [2003/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314556 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1314556 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1314556 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41F21/08, B65H29/04 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
B65H29/041 (EP);
B41F21/08 (EP);
B65H29/042 (EP);
B65H2404/341 (EP);
B65H2801/21 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/22] | B41F21/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/42] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bogenausleger für eine bogenverarbeitende Maschine | [2003/22] | English: | Sheet delivering device for a sheet-processing machine | [2003/22] | French: | Receveur de feuilles pour une machine de traitement de feuilles | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1152425 (HARRIS INTERTYPE CORP) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [YD]DE2111049 (KOENIG & BAUER SCHNELLPRESSFAB) [YD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [YD]DE2308025 (MILLER PRINTING MACHINERY CO) [YD] 3,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS59167258 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]US4722276 (TYLER JACK D [US]) [Y] 7,8 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0275882 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]DE4111262 (MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG) [Y] 5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 1; figure 1 * |