EP1318243 - Unit consisting of a flush-mountable sanitary fitting and a device for mounting the flush-mountable sanitary fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/24] | Device for flush-mounting sanitary fittings | ||
[2004/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minol International GmbH & Co. KG Gänsheidestrasse 101 70186 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmann, Werner Gänseheidestrasse 101 70186 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026062.6 | 22.11.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | DE2001159448 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10159448 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1318243 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318243 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, E03C1/042, E03B7/07, E03D1/012, G01F15/18, G01F15/14 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
E03B7/072 (EP);
E03B7/095 (EP);
E03C1/042 (EP);
G01F15/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | Einheit bestehend aus einer Unterputz-Sanitärarmatur und einer Vorrichtung zur Montage der Unterputz-Sanitärarmatur | [2004/22] | English: | Unit consisting of a flush-mountable sanitary fitting and a device for mounting the flush-mountable sanitary fitting | [2004/22] | French: | Unité consistant en une armature sanitaire encastrable et en un dispositif pour le montage de cette armature | [2004/22] |
Former [2003/24] | Vorrichtung zur Montage von Unterputz-Sanitärarmaturen | ||
Former [2003/24] | Device for flush-mounting sanitary fittings | ||
Former [2003/24] | Dispositif pour aligner de armatures sanitaires | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 10.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.10.2004 | CY | 20.10.2004 | CZ | 20.10.2004 | EE | 20.10.2004 | FI | 20.10.2004 | FR | 20.10.2004 | GB | 20.10.2004 | IE | 20.10.2004 | IT | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | SE | 20.10.2004 | SK | 20.10.2004 | TR | 20.10.2004 | BE | 30.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | DK | 20.01.2005 | GR | 20.01.2005 | ES | 31.01.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/38] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CY | 20.10.2004 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
EE | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
IT | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SE | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CY | 20.10.2004 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
EE | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SE | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CY | 20.10.2004 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
EE | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/03] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
EE | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
SK | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
CZ | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3826064 (FIDES TREUHAND GMBH [CH]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 61 - line 62; figure 1 * * column 2, line 16 - line 57 *; | [A]GB2283767 (CAROMA IND LTD [AU]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 2 - line 6; figure 9 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 17 *; | [A]EP0863265 (MINOL MESSTECHNIK W LEHMANN GM [DE]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * * column 1, line 54 - line 56 *; | [A]EP0964105 (PROSAN D O O [SI]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP1006244 (HANSGROHE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 14; figure 1 * |