EP1422734 - Data entry device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IEE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRONICS & ENGINEERING S.A. Zone Industrielle 6468 Echternach / LU | [2004/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serban, Bogdan 17, Domaine Op Hals 3376 Leudelange / LU | 02 /
Boyer, Philippe 4, rue du Président Kennedy 57570 Cattenom / FR | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Beissel, Jean, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Beissel, Jean, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A., B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 02026166.5 | 25.11.2002 | [2004/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422734 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70, H03M11/24 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H03M11/24 (EP);
H01H13/70 (EP);
H01H2239/012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/07] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dateneingangsverfahren | [2004/22] | English: | Data entry device | [2004/22] | French: | Dispositif d'entrée de données | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0134853 (AMP INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0266229 (MCB [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0489344 (IEE SARL [LU]) [DA] 1 * page R *; | [DA]LU88024 (IEE SARL [LU]) [DA] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0917293 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 10,11 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 5 * |