EP1316740 - One way clutch assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Hirohito K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026182.2 | 25.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | JP20010364634 | 29.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001364634 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316740 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1316740 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/06 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
F16D41/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/13] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einwegkupplungseinheit | [2003/23] | English: | One way clutch assembly | [2003/23] | French: | Ensemble d'embrayage à roue libre | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 01.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001108054 ; | [XA]GB826548 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [X] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 10 - line 35 * * figures 1,4,5 * [A] 10-12; | [XA]US3087590 (GORSKY RUDOLPH J) [X] 1,2,7,10,11,13,14 * column 1, line 12 - line 28 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 32 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 17,18; | [XA]US3118525 (HAROLD FISCHER) [X] 1,2,6,10,11,13,14 * column 1, line 8 - line 17 * * column 2, line 7 - line 20 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 17,18; | [A]EP0204190 (THERMO KING CORP [US]) [A] 16 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 19 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0254295 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 24,25 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - line 19 ** figure 2 *; | [A]EP1101978 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 8,9,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 13 * * figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP1243448 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [PA] 16,21,23,24,27-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1-3,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001108054 A 20010420 (SIGMA CORP) [A] 5 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH1130182 |